NC H964 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-29 - Ch. SL 2012-133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-29 - Ch. SL 2012-133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
North Carolina Longitudinal Data System
Title
North Carolina Longitudinal Data System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-26 - House - M11 Concur\S. Amd. 2 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - M11 Concur\S. Amd. 1 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - A1 Blackwell\Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - M11 Concur\S. Amd. 1 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - A1 Blackwell\Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-29 | Ch. SL 2012-133 | |
2012-06-29 | Signed By Gov. 6/29/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Ratified | |
2012-06-26 | Concurred In S Amend 2 | |
2012-06-26 | Concurred In S Amend 1 | |
2012-06-25 | Placed On Cal For 6/26/2012 | |
2012-06-25 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-25 | Rec To Concur In S Amend 1 & 2 | |
2012-06-25 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-25 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-25 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2012-06-21 | Com Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-21 | Reptd Fav As Amended | |
2012-06-19 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2012-06-19 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-06-14 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2012-06-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-14 | Rec From House | |
2012-06-13 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2012-06-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-13 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-12 | Placed On Cal For 6/13/2012 | |
2012-06-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-12 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-05-17 | Ref To Com On Education | |
2012-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-16 | Filed |