NC H960 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-07 - Ref To Com On Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-07 - Ref To Com On Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Protect Homeowners With Underwater Mortgages
Title
Protect Homeowners With Underwater Mortgages
Sponsors
Rep. William Brawley [R] | Rep. Beverly Earle [D] | Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
Rep. William McGee [R] | Sen. Timothy Moffitt [R] | Rep. Rodney Moore [D] | Rep. Mitchell Setzer [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - House - A2 Stam\Second Reading (Y: 76 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-05 - House - A1 Moffitt\Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - House - A2 Stam\Second Reading (Y: 76 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-05 - House - A1 Moffitt\Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2012-06-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-07 | Rec From House | |
2012-06-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-06 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2012-06-05 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-04 | Postponed To 6/5/2012 | |
2012-05-31 | Placed On Cal For 6/4/2012 | |
2012-05-31 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-05-31 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-17 | Ref To Com On Banking | |
2012-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-16 | Filed |