NC H937 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Ch. SL 2011-404
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Ch. SL 2011-404
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Lewis Dollar Dockham 3
Title
Lewis Dollar Dockham 3
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-27 - House - As Amended\M11 Concur (Y: 66 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-07-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-07-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 0 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-07-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-07-25 - House - A4 Rapp\Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-07-25 - House - A3 Jackson\Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 69 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-07-25 - House - A2 Alexander,K\Second Reading (Y: 52 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-07-25 - House - A1 Martin\Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-07-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-07-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 0 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-07-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-07-25 - House - A4 Rapp\Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-07-25 - House - A3 Jackson\Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 69 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-07-25 - House - A2 Alexander,K\Second Reading (Y: 52 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-07-25 - House - A1 Martin\Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-28 | Ch. SL 2011-404 | |
2011-07-28 | Ratified | |
2011-07-27 | Concurred in SCS as Amended | |
2011-07-27 | Placed On Cal For 7/27/2011 | |
2011-07-27 | Rec to Concur in SCS as Amended | |
2011-07-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-07-27 | Placed On Cal For 7/27/2011 | |
2011-07-27 | Com Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-07-27 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-07-27 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-07-25 | Ref To Com On Redistricting | |
2011-07-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-07-25 | Rec From House | |
2011-07-25 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-07-25 | Amend Failed 4 | |
2011-07-25 | Amend Failed 3 | |
2011-07-25 | Amend Failed 2 | |
2011-07-25 | Amend Failed 1 | |
2011-07-24 | Placed On Cal For 7/25/2011 | |
2011-07-24 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-07-24 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-07-21 | Ref To Com On Redistricting | |
2011-07-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-07-19 | Filed |