NC H927 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - Ch. SL 2009-69
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - Ch. SL 2009-69
Summary
ABC Capital Project/County Funds.
Title
ABC Capital Project/County Funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-08 | Ch. SL 2009-69 | |
2009-06-08 | Ratified | |
2009-06-04 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-03 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-07 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-05-07 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-05 | Placed On Cal For 5/6/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-05 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-27 | Re-ref Com On Alcoholic Beverage Control | |
2009-04-27 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-01 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Alcoholic Beverage Control | |
2009-04-01 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H927 |