NC H90 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Ch. SL 2018-2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Ch. SL 2018-2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Changes to Education and Election Laws
Title
Changes to Education and Election Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 104 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt Conference Report (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt Conference Report (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Ch. SL 2018-2 | |
2018-03-16 | House | Became Law W/o Signature |
2018-02-13 | Pres. To Gov. 2/13/2018 | |
2018-02-13 | Ratified | |
2018-02-13 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-02-13 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 02/13/2018 |
2018-02-08 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 02/09/2018 |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 02/09/2018 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-02-08 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d) |
2018-02-08 | House | Reptd Fav For Adoption |
2018-02-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2018-02-08 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2018-02-07 | House | Conferees Changed |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2017-06-29 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2017-06-29 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2017 |
2017-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-03-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/22/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-03-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-15 | House | Ref To Com On Education - K-12 |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-14 | House | Filed |