NC H898 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Walter Church
Title
Honor Walter Church
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/01/2013 |
2013-04-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-04-15 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Filed |