NC H864 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Require Driver Retraining Course
Title
Require Driver Retraining Course
Sponsors
Rep. Phillip Shepard [R] | Rep. John Torbett [R] | Rep. Sarah Stevens [R] | Rep. Garland Pierce [D] |
Rep. Shelly Willingham [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-26 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-06-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-05-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-05-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-22 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Filed |