NC H854 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Land Use Clarifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land Use Clarifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-08SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-09-08SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-09-08SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-09-07SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-09-07SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-12SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-12SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-12SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-12HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-11HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-11HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-05-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-11HouseReptd Fav
2021-05-11HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-11HouseReptd Fav
2021-05-05HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-05HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
160D108(n/a)Citation Text
160D1402(n/a)Citation Text
160D406(n/a)Citation Text
160D706(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback