NC H823 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 45-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminate School Choice Program Waitlists

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminate School Choice Program Waitlists

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 28 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 28 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - A1 Cotham Second Reading (Y: 80 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - A2 Gill Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - A3 von Haefen Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - A4 von Haefen Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 65 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-07HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2024-05-06HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2024-05-06SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2024-05-02SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2024-05-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2024-05-02SenateAmend Tabled A2
2024-05-02SenateAmend Tabled A1
2024-05-01SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2024-05-01SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2024-04-29SenateRe-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
2024-04-29SenateWithdrawn From Com
2023-05-18SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2023-05-18SenatePassed 1st Reading
2023-05-18HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2023-05-18SenateRegular Message Received From House
2023-05-17HouseOrdered Engrossed
2023-05-17HousePassed 3rd Reading
2023-05-17HousePassed 2nd Reading
2023-05-17HouseAmend Failed A4
2023-05-17HouseAmend Failed A3
2023-05-17HouseAmend Failed A2
2023-05-17HouseAmend Adopted A1
2023-05-16HousePlaced On Cal For 05/17/2023
2023-05-16HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2023-05-16HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2023-05-11HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2023-05-11HouseWithdrawn From Com
2023-05-02HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations
2023-05-02HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2023-04-19HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2023-04-19HousePassed 1st Reading
2023-04-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S406 (Same As) 2023-04-26 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
115C(n/a)Citation Text
115C562.8(n/a)Citation Text
115C600(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2023/H823
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H823v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H823v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H823v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H823v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H823v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H823v5.pdf
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H823-SMTC-67(CSTC-31)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H823-SMTC-82(CSTC-39)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H823-SMTC-83(e3)-v-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H823-SMMT-1(CSMTa-2)-v-12
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/H/388
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/H/387
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/H/386
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/H/385
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/H/384
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/S/517
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/S/518
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/S/519

Bill Comments

feedback