NC H789 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Ch. SL 2013-108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Ch. SL 2013-108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
USTs Eligible for Brownfields
Title
USTs Eligible for Brownfields
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Ch. SL 2013-108 | |
2013-06-12 | Signed by Gov. 6/12/2013 | |
2013-06-07 | Pres. To Gov. 6/7/2013 | |
2013-06-06 | Ratified | |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/30/2013 |
2013-04-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-11 | House | Ref To Com On Environment |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-10 | House | Filed |