NC H740 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
SAR Rename/Disputed County Boundaries/Mapping
Title
SAR Rename/Disputed County Boundaries/Mapping
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Ch. SL 2017-170 | |
2017-07-21 | Signed by Gov. 7/21/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Ratified | |
2017-06-28 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-28 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | House | Concurred In S Amend SA1 |
2017-06-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub and S Amend |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-21 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-04-20 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-20 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-13 | House | Ref To Com On State and Local Government II |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Filed |