NC H725 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-22 - Re-ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-22 - Re-ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Earned Wage Access Services Act
Title
Earned Wage Access Services Act
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Moffitt [R] | Rep. Chris Humphrey [R] | Rep. Kyle Hall [R] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Rep. Shelly Willingham [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-22 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-07-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-05 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2021-05-05 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Added |
2021-05-05 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2021-04-29 | House | Ref to the Com on Banking, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Banking Comn.
Banks
Commerce
Commissioner Of Banks
Financial Institutions
Financial Services
Licenses & Permits
Loans
Public
Banks
Commerce
Commissioner Of Banks
Financial Institutions
Financial Services
Licenses & Permits
Loans
Public
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
53 | 440 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 441 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 442 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 443 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 444 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 445 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 446 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 447 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 448 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 449 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 450 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 451 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 452 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 453 | (n/a) | Citation Text |