NC H720 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Davidson Community College
Title
Honor Davidson Community College
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-08 - House - R2 For Adoption (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-07 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/08/2013 |
2013-05-07 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-04-11 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-10 | House | Filed |