NC H717 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Ch. SL 2018-121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Judicial Elections Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judicial Elections Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - House - Veto Override (Y: 74 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-10-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 69 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-10-05 - House - A11 Richardson, W. Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-10-05 - House - A9 Pierce Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-10-05 - House - A8 Morey Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 66 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-10-05 - House - A3 Fisher Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 65 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-10-05 - House - A7 Pierce Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-10-05 - House - A6 Graham, C. Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 66 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-10-05 - House - A4 Floyd Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-10-05 - House - A2 Willingham Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-10-05 - House - A1 Reives Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28 Ch. SL 2018-121
2018-06-28SenateVeto Overridden
2018-06-27SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/28/2018
2018-06-27SenateVeto Received From House
2018-06-27HouseVeto Overridden
2018-06-25HousePlaced On Cal For 06/27/2018
2018-06-25HouseReceived from the Governor
2018-06-25 Vetoed 06/25/2018
2018-06-15 Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018
2018-06-15 Ratified
2018-06-15HouseOrdered Enrolled
2018-06-15SenateConf Report Adopted
2018-06-15SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-06-15SenateConf Rept Re-submitted
2018-06-15SenateConf Rept Withdrawn
2018-06-15HouseConf Report #2 Adopted
2018-06-15HouseAdded to Calendar
2018-06-15HouseConf Com Reported
2018-06-15HouseConf Rpt Withdrawn
2018-06-14HousePlaced On Cal For 06/15/2018
2018-06-14HouseConf Com Reported
2018-06-14SenateConf Com Reported
2018-06-12HouseConferees Changed
2018-06-11SenateConf Com Appointed
2018-06-07HouseConf Com Appointed
2018-06-07HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2018-06-06HousePlaced On Cal For 06/07/2018
2018-06-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-06-06HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2018-06-06SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2018-06-06SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-06SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2018-06-06SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-06-06SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2018-06-06SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2018-06-05SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-05SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2018-06-05SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-06-05SenateReptd Fav
2018-06-04SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-04SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2018-06-04SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2018-05-31SenateRe-ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-05-31SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-10-09SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-10-09SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-10-09SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2017-10-05HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2017-10-05HouseOrdered Engrossed
2017-10-05HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-10-05HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-10-05HouseAmend Failed A11
2017-10-05HouseAmendment Withdrawn A10
2017-10-05HouseAmend Adopted A9
2017-10-05HouseAmend Failed A8
2017-10-05HouseAmend Failed A3
2017-10-05HouseAmend Adopted A7
2017-10-05HouseAmend Failed A6
2017-10-05HouseAmendment Withdrawn A5
2017-10-05HouseAmend Adopted A4
2017-10-05HouseAmend Adopted A2
2017-10-05HouseAmend Adopted A1
2017-10-04HousePlaced On Cal For 10/05/2017
2017-10-04HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-10-04HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 3
2017-10-04HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2017-10-04HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2017-08-30HouseRe-ref Com On House Select Committee on Judicial Redistricting
2017-08-30HouseWithdrawn From Com
2017-06-27HouseRe-ref Com On Elections and Ethics Law
2017-06-27HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-06-27HousePlaced On Cal For 06/28/2017
2017-06-27HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-06-26HousePlaced On Cal For 06/27/2017
2017-06-26HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-06-26HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-04-11HouseRef To Com On Judiciary I
2017-04-11HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-10HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=H717&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H717v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H717v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H717v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H717v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H717v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H717v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H717v6.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H717v7.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H717v8.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H717v9.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H717v10.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=936
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=937
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=938
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=939
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=940
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=941
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=942
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=943
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=944
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=945
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=588
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1015
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=719
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1216
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1271
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=786

Bill Comments

feedback