NC H693 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-21 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-21 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Common Carrier ABC Permit
Title
Common Carrier ABC Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 88 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-06-17 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-06-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-16 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-06-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Abc Comn.
Alcoholic Beverages
Beer & Wine
Commerce
Commissions
Fees
Licenses & Permits
Motor Vehicles
Public
Taxis & Shuttles
Transportation
Alcoholic Beverages
Beer & Wine
Commerce
Commissions
Fees
Licenses & Permits
Motor Vehicles
Public
Taxis & Shuttles
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
18B | 1001 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18B | 401 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18B | 902 | (n/a) | Citation Text |