NC H660 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Drivers License/Reciprocity W/Foreign Nation
Title
Drivers License/Reciprocity W/Foreign Nation
Sponsors
Rep. James Boles [R] | Rep. Kelly Alexander [D] | Rep. Beverly Boswell [R] | Rep. Jean Farmer-Butterfield [D] |
Rep. Evelyn Terry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-25 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/25/2017 |
2017-04-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-11 | House | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S651 (Same As) 2017-04-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate