NC H63 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Ch. SL 2009-18
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Ch. SL 2009-18
Summary
Modify Onslow County Sales Tax Distribution.
Title
Modify Onslow County Sales Tax Distribution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Ch. SL 2009-18 | |
2009-04-29 | Ratified | |
2009-04-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-22 | Placed On Cal For 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-31 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-03-31 | Rec From House | |
2009-03-30 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Placed On Cal For 3/30/2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-03-26 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-02-25 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-02-25 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-12 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-02-12 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-02-05 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-02-05 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S81 (Same As) 2011-03-31 - Ch. SL 2011-17
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H63 |