NC H621 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Increase Dropout Age/Completion Indicator
Title
Increase Dropout Age/Completion Indicator
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-21 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115C | 12 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 238.66 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 378 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 83.15 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 83.16 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115D | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115D | 5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
116 | 235 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 239.8 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
143B | 805 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
7B | 1501 | (n/a) | Citation Text |