NC H620 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Ch. SL 2017-141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Ch. SL 2017-141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
UNC Capital Projects
Title
UNC Capital Projects
Sponsors
Rep. William Brawley [R] | Rep. Jason Saine [R] | Rep. John Szoka [R] | Rep. David Rogers [R] |
Rep. Kelly Alexander [D] | Rep. Verla Insko [D] | Rep. Rodney Moore [D] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Ch. SL 2017-141 | |
2017-07-20 | Signed by Gov. 7/20/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Ratified | |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-06-08 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-06-08 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-07 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/07/2017 |
2017-06-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-05-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-05-26 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-10 | House | Ref To Com On Appropriations, Capital |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Filed |