NC H591 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Ch. SL 2024-37
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Modernize Sex Crimes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modernize Sex Crimes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-27 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-08 Ch. SL 2024-37
2024-07-08 Signed by Gov. 7/8/2024
2024-06-28 Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2024
2024-06-28 Ratified
2024-06-27HouseOrdered Enrolled
2024-06-27HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2024-06-27HouseAdded to Calendar
2024-06-27HouseWithdrawn From Com
2024-05-16HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2024-05-16HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2024-05-16SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2024-05-15SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2024-05-15SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2024-05-15SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2024-05-15SenateReptd Fav
2024-05-14SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2024-05-14SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2024-05-14SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2024-05-02SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2024-05-02SenateWithdrawn From Com
2023-06-27SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2023-06-27SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2023-06-27SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2023-06-20SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2023-06-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2023-05-01SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2023-05-01SenatePassed 1st Reading
2023-05-01SenateRegular Message Received From House
2023-04-28HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2023-04-27HousePassed 3rd Reading
2023-04-27HousePassed 2nd Reading
2023-04-27HouseAdded to Calendar
2023-04-27HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2023-04-27HouseReptd Fav
2023-04-26HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2023-04-26HouseReptd Fav
2023-04-13HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2023-04-13HousePassed 1st Reading
2023-04-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2023/H591
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H591v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H591v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H591v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H591v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H591v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H591v5.pdf
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H591-SMRN-43(e1)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H591-SMRN-53(e1)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H591-SMCE-73(e1)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H591-SMCE-105(e3)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/H591-SMCE-98(CSCE-37)-v-4
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/H/276
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/S/525
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/H/773

Bill Comments

feedback