NC H589 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-27 - Ch. SL 2017-192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-27 - Ch. SL 2017-192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Competitive Energy Solutions for NC
Title
Competitive Energy Solutions for NC
Sponsors
Rep. John Szoka [R] | Rep. Dean Arp [R] | Rep. Samuel Watford [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 66 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - For Adoption Conference Report (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - A1 Dixon Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - For Adoption Conference Report (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - A1 Dixon Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-27 | Ch. SL 2017-192 | |
2017-07-27 | Signed by Gov. 7/27/2017 | |
2017-06-30 | Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2017 | |
2017-06-30 | Ratified | |
2017-06-30 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-30 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2017-06-30 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-30 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2017-06-28 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2017-06-28 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-06-08 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-06-07 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-06-07 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-07 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-07 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/07/2017 |
2017-06-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-06-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-06 | House | Ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Finance |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Filed |