NC H581 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Ch. SL 2011-143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Ch. SL 2011-143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Lumberton Firemen's Pension Fund
Title
Amend Lumberton Firemen's Pension Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Ch. SL 2011-143 | |
2011-06-15 | Ratified | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-10 | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging | |
2011-06-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-10 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/9/2011 | |
2011-06-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-07 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-06-07 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-04 | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-04-04 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-31 | Filed |