NC H581 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-27 - Ch. SL 2009-362
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-27 - Ch. SL 2009-362
Summary
Partition Sales/Extend Report & Answer Times.
Title
Partition Sales/Extend Report & Answer Times.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-27 | Ch. SL 2009-362 | |
2009-07-27 | Signed By Gov. 7/27/2009 | |
2009-07-17 | Pres. To Gov. 7/17/2009 | |
2009-07-16 | Ratified | |
2009-07-15 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-07-14 | Placed On Cal For 7/15/2009 | |
2009-07-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-13 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-07-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2009 | |
2009-07-01 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-06-30 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-06-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-15 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-04-15 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-13 | Placed On Cal For 4/14/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-02 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-04-02 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-16 | Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-03-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S612 (Same As) 2012-06-07 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H581 |