NC H58 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-9)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Nonprofit Grants/Increase Accountability
Title
Nonprofit Grants/Increase Accountability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2013-03-14 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-03-13 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-03-13 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Stricken |
2013-03-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2013-03-13 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-02-05 | House | Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Appropriations |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-01-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S144 (Same As) 2014-05-19 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget