NC S144 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-19 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-19 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Nonprofit Grants/Increase Accountability
Title
Nonprofit Grants/Increase Accountability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/19/2014 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/30/2013 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Program Evaluation |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H58 (Same As) 2013-03-14 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations