NC H565 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-10 - Postponed To 5/12/2010
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-10 - Postponed To 5/12/2010
Summary
Union Fire Fees.
Title
Union Fire Fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-10 | Postponed To 5/12/2010 | |
2009-08-10 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-08-10 | Concurred On 2nd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-06 | Amends Ruled Material | |
2009-08-06 | Rec To Concur In S Amend | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-08-04 | Com Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-08-04 | Reptd Fav As Amended | |
2009-05-20 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-05-12 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Placed On Cal For 5/7/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-15 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-04-15 | Reptd Without Prejudice | |
2009-03-16 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H565 |