NC H562 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Ch. SL 2015-195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Ch. SL 2015-195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Firearm Laws
Title
Amend Firearm Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - A19 Glazier M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - A18 Turner, B. Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - A16 Fisher Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 79 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-06-17 - House - A15 Cunningham Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-06-17 - House - A14 Speciale Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-06-17 - House - A13 Adams Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - A10 Lewis Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 78 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - A9 Ager Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-06-16 - House - A8 Luebke Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 73 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-06-16 - House - A7 Pendleton Second Reading (Y: 61 N: 51 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - A6 Daughtry Second Reading (Y: 69 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - A6 Daughtry M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - A4 Turner, R. Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - A5 McNeill Second Reading (Y: 77 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - A3 Cleveland Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - A2 Adams Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - A1 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - A19 Glazier M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - A18 Turner, B. Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - A16 Fisher Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 79 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-06-17 - House - A15 Cunningham Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-06-17 - House - A14 Speciale Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-06-17 - House - A13 Adams Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - A10 Lewis Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 78 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - A9 Ager Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-06-16 - House - A8 Luebke Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 73 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-06-16 - House - A7 Pendleton Second Reading (Y: 61 N: 51 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - A6 Daughtry Second Reading (Y: 69 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - A6 Daughtry M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - A4 Turner, R. Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - A5 McNeill Second Reading (Y: 77 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - A3 Cleveland Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - A2 Adams Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - A1 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-05 | Ch. SL 2015-195 | |
2015-08-05 | Signed by Gov. 8/5/2015 | |
2015-07-29 | Pres. To Gov. 7/29/2015 | |
2015-07-28 | Ratified | |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-06-18 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-06-17 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-06-17 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-17 | House | Amend Tabled A19 |
2015-06-17 | House | Amend Adopted A18 |
2015-06-17 | House | Amendment Withdrawn A17 |
2015-06-17 | House | Amend Failed A16 |
2015-06-17 | House | Amend Failed A15 |
2015-06-17 | House | Amend Failed A14 |
2015-06-17 | House | Amendment Withdrawn A12 |
2015-06-17 | House | Amend Adopted A13 |
2015-06-17 | House | Amendment Withdrawn A11 |
2015-06-17 | House | Amend Adopted A10 |
2015-06-16 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-06-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-16 | House | Amend Failed A9 |
2015-06-16 | House | Amend Failed A8 |
2015-06-16 | House | Amend Adopted A7 |
2015-06-16 | House | Amend Adopted A6 |
2015-06-16 | House | Amend Adopted A4 |
2015-06-16 | House | Amend Adopted A5 |
2015-06-16 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2015-06-16 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2015-06-16 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-06-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/16/2015 |
2015-06-15 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-06-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-06-08 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-06-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/08/2015 |
2015-06-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 3 |
2015-05-12 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-05-12 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2015-04-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2015-04-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-06 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2015-04-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-02 | House | Filed |