NC H560 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-13 - Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement
Pending: House Pensions and Retirement Committee
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-13 - Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement
Pending: House Pensions and Retirement Committee
Summary
Midland Retirement.
Title
Midland Retirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-13 | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement | |
2009-04-13 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-12 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Pensions and Retirement | |
2009-03-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S390 (Same As) 2011-03-23 - Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H560 |