NC H559 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - Ch. SL 2017-182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - Ch. SL 2017-182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Outdoor Heritage Enhanced
Title
Outdoor Heritage Enhanced
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Millis [R] | Rep. John Bell [R] | Rep. James Adams [R] | Rep. Beverly Boswell [R] |
Rep. George Cleveland [R] | Rep. Lawrence Yarborough [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 80 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt Conference Report (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt Conference Report (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Ch. SL 2017-182 | |
2017-07-25 | Signed by Gov. 7/25/2017 | |
2017-06-30 | Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2017 | |
2017-06-30 | Ratified | |
2017-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-29 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2017-06-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-29 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2017-06-28 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2017-06-28 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2017 |
2017-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-27 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/19/2017 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-26 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/25/2017 |
2017-04-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-05 | House | Ref To Com On Wildlife Resources |
2017-04-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S624 (Same As) 2017-04-19 - Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate