NC H551 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Landlord-Tenant and HOA Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landlord-Tenant and HOA Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2023-05-01SenatePassed 1st Reading
2023-05-01SenateRegular Message Received From House
2023-04-28HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2023-04-27HousePassed 3rd Reading
2023-04-27HousePassed 2nd Reading
2023-04-27HouseAdded to Calendar
2023-04-27HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2023-04-27HouseReptd Fav
2023-04-26HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2023-04-26HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2023-04-04HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2023-04-04HousePassed 1st Reading
2023-04-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S553 (Same As) 2023-04-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback