NC H522 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Study Outside Water Rates
Title
Study Outside Water Rates
Sponsors
Rep. John Szoka [R] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Chris Humphrey [R] | Rep. Charles McGrady [R] |
Rep. Larry Pittman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-26 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-25 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-01 | House | Ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Filed |