NC H483 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Let Them Spawn

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Let Them Spawn

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - House - M4 Previous Question Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - A1 Hawkins Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - A2 Yarborough Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 58 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-24SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-06-24SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-06-21HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-06-20HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-06-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-19HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-19HouseAmend Adopted A2
2019-06-19HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-06-18HousePlaced On Cal For 06/19/2019
2019-06-18HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-18HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-04-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-25HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-16HouseRe-ref Com On Environment
2019-04-16HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-28HouseRef to the Com on Wildlife Resources, if favorable, Environment, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-28HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-27HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H483
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H483v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H483v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H483v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H483v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H483v4.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/506
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/505
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/504
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/518
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/517

Bill Comments

feedback