NC H469 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Ch. Res 2021-5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Ch. Res 2021-5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm Wanda Taylor/Industrial Commission
Title
Confirm Wanda Taylor/Industrial Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Destin Hall [R] | Sen. Gale Adcock [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Zack Forde-Hawkins [D] |
Rep. William Richardson [D] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | House | Ch. Res 2021-5 |
2021-05-24 | Ratified | |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Select Committee on Nominations |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Select Committee on Nominations |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-04-01 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-04-01 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2021-04-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-01 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-04-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-04-01 | House | Cal Pursuant 32 |
2021-04-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-31 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Appointments
Commerce
Commissions
Confirmation
General Assembly
Governor
Industrial Comn.
Joint
Public Officials
Resolutions
Commerce
Commissions
Confirmation
General Assembly
Governor
Industrial Comn.
Joint
Public Officials
Resolutions