NC H467 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Ch. SL 2017-11
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Agriculture and Forestry Nuisance Remedies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture and Forestry Nuisance Remedies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Veto Override (Y: 74 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 74 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - A1 Blust Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - M6 Reconsider Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 64 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11 Ch. SL 2017-11
2017-05-11SenateVeto Overridden
2017-05-10SenatePlaced On Cal For 05/11/2017
2017-05-10SenateVeto Received from House
2017-05-10HouseVeto Overridden
2017-05-08HousePlaced On Cal For 05/10/2017
2017-05-05 Vetoed 05/05/2017
2017-05-05HouseReceived from the Governor
2017-04-27 Pres. To Gov. 4/27/2017
2017-04-27 Ratified
2017-04-27HouseOrdered Enrolled
2017-04-27HouseConcurred In S/Com Sub
2017-04-27HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-04-27HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2017-04-27HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2017-04-27SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2017-04-26SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-04-26SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Today's Supplemental Calendar
2017-04-26SenateReptd Fav
2017-04-26SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-26SenateReptd Fav
2017-04-25SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-25SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-04-25SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-25SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2017-04-25SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-04-24SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-24SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-04-11SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-11SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-11SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-04-11HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-04-10HouseOrdered Engrossed
2017-04-10HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-04-10HouseAmend Adopted A1
2017-04-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-04-05HousePlaced On Cal For 04/06/2017
2017-04-05HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-04-05HouseReptd Fav
2017-03-27HouseRef To Com On Judiciary III
2017-03-27HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-03-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S460 (Same As) 2017-04-04 - Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=H467&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H467v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H467v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H467v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H467v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H467v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H467v5.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=173
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=174
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=198
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=199
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=188
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=472
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=488
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=193

Bill Comments

feedback