NC S460 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Agriculture and Forestry Nuisance Remedies
Title
Agriculture and Forestry Nuisance Remedies
Sponsors
Sen. William Jackson [R] | Sen. James Bishop [R] | Sen. William Rabon [R] | Sen. Andrew Brock [R] |
Sen. Norman Sanderson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H467 (Same As) 2017-05-11 - Ch. SL 2017-11