NC H449 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on September 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-04 - Ch. SL 2019-213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on September 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-04 - Ch. SL 2019-213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Handicapped & Special Registration Plates
Title
Handicapped & Special Registration Plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-28 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-04 | Ch. SL 2019-213 | |
2019-09-04 | Signed by Gov. 9/4/2019 | |
2019-08-28 | Pres. To Gov. 8/28/2019 | |
2019-08-28 | Ratified | |
2019-08-28 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-08-28 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2019-08-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/28/2019 |
2019-08-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d) |
2019-08-27 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/27/2019 |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2019-08-06 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-07-10 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-07-10 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2019-07-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/10/2019 |
2019-07-09 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2019-07-09 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-17 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-04-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-26 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-25 | House | Filed |