NC H445 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Special Sep. Allowance/Alamance Cty DOs
Title
Special Sep. Allowance/Alamance Cty DOs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-05-03 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-02 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-05-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement |
2019-04-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-25 | House | Serial Referral To Pensions and Retirement Stricken |
2019-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-26 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-25 | House | Filed |