NC H426 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Ch. SL 2017-55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Ch. SL 2017-55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sanford-Lee County Airport Authority Changes
Title
Sanford-Lee County Airport Authority Changes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Ch. SL 2017-55 | |
2017-06-27 | Ratified | |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/05/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-22 | House | Ref To Com On State and Local Government I |
2017-03-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Filed |