NC H42 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - Re-ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - Re-ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Rowan-Salisbury Bd. of Ed. Election Method
Title
Rowan-Salisbury Bd. of Ed. Election Method
Sponsors
Rep. Harry Warren [R] | Sen. Carl Ford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Re-ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-03-21 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-20 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2017-03-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/20/2017 |
2017-03-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-03-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-07 | House | Ref To Com On Elections and Ethics Law |
2017-02-07 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed |