NC H412 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Ch. SL 2013-219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Ch. SL 2013-219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Eden/Duke Energy/Annexation Agreement
Title
Eden/Duke Energy/Annexation Agreement
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Ch. SL 2013-219 | |
2013-06-27 | Ratified | |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2013 |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/30/2013 |
2013-04-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-04-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-25 | House | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance |
2013-03-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-21 | House | Filed |