NC H406 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Ch. SL 2017-36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Ch. SL 2017-36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Repeal Orange County Impact Fees
Title
Repeal Orange County Impact Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - A1 Meyer Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 79 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - A1 Meyer Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 79 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Ch. SL 2017-36 | |
2017-06-20 | Ratified | |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/19/2017 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-26 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-20 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-20 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-04-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-04 | House | Re-ref to the Com on State and Local Government I, if favorable, Finance |
2017-04-04 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-04 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2017-03-21 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government II, if favorable, Finance |
2017-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-20 | House | Filed |