NC H384 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Increase Penalties/Organized Retail Theft
Title
Increase Penalties/Organized Retail Theft
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Ch. SL 2017-162 | |
2017-07-21 | Signed by Gov. 7/21/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Ratified | |
2017-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-29 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2017 |
2017-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/10/2017 |
2017-04-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III |
2017-03-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-20 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2017-03-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S409 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate