NC H356 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Ch. SL 2021-6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Ch. SL 2021-6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Speaker/PPT Appointments 2021
Title
Speaker/PPT Appointments 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Destin Hall [R] | Rep. Jake Johnson [R] | Sen. Timothy Moffitt [R] | Rep. David Rogers [R] |
Rep. Jason Saine [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Ch. SL 2021-6 | |
2021-03-31 | Ratified | |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Select Committee on Nominations |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-03-25 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-03-24 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-24 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-03-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/24/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-03-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-23 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
911 Board
Administrative Rules
Appointments
Arts
Asheville
Boards
Boxing Advisory Comn.
Brain Injury Council
Buncombe County
Chaptered
Charter Schools
Charter Schools Advisory Board
Commissions
Corporations
Councils
Counties
Crimes
Cultural Resources
Dhhs
Disabled Persons
Education
Education Commission Of The States
Emergency Services
Ethics
General Assembly
Governor
Governor's Crime Comn.
Health Services
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Institute Of Medicine
Interstate Cooperation
It Strategy Board
Judges
Judicial Standards Comn.
Law Enforcement
Magistrates
Minors
Mobile Phones & Devices
Municipalities
New Hanover County
Nonprofit
Partnership For Children
President Pro Tempore
Public
Public Instruction Dept.
Ratified
Rules Review Comn.
School Of The Arts
School Of The Arts Board
Secondary Education
Speaker
Sports
Telecommunications
Unc
Wilmington
Administrative Rules
Appointments
Arts
Asheville
Boards
Boxing Advisory Comn.
Brain Injury Council
Buncombe County
Chaptered
Charter Schools
Charter Schools Advisory Board
Commissions
Corporations
Councils
Counties
Crimes
Cultural Resources
Dhhs
Disabled Persons
Education
Education Commission Of The States
Emergency Services
Ethics
General Assembly
Governor
Governor's Crime Comn.
Health Services
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Institute Of Medicine
Interstate Cooperation
It Strategy Board
Judges
Judicial Standards Comn.
Law Enforcement
Magistrates
Minors
Mobile Phones & Devices
Municipalities
New Hanover County
Nonprofit
Partnership For Children
President Pro Tempore
Public
Public Instruction Dept.
Ratified
Rules Review Comn.
School Of The Arts
School Of The Arts Board
Secondary Education
Speaker
Sports
Telecommunications
Unc
Wilmington