NC H349 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Traffic-Control Training Program
Title
Traffic-Control Training Program
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Brody [R] | Rep. Allen McNeill [R] | Rep. James Adams [R] | Rep. Jerry Carter [R] |
Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Edward Goodwin [R] | Rep. Patricia Hurley [R] | Rep. Larry Pittman [R] |
Rep. Wayne Sasser [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/05/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Education - Community Colleges |
2021-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary 3 |
2021-03-30 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary 3, if favorable, Education - Community Colleges, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Colleges & Universities
Community Colleges
Curriculum
Education
Emergency Services
Employment
Higher Education
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Personnel
Public
Roads & Highways
Traffic Control Devices
Transportation
Vocational Education
Community Colleges
Curriculum
Education
Emergency Services
Employment
Higher Education
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Personnel
Public
Roads & Highways
Traffic Control Devices
Transportation
Vocational Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
20 | 114.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |