NC H347 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Ch. SL 2023-42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Ch. SL 2023-42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Sports Wagering/Horse Racing Wagering
Title
Sports Wagering/Horse Racing Wagering
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - House - R3 Ruled Mat'l M11 Concur (Y: 69 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l M11 Concur (Y: 67 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l M4 Previous Question (Y: 71 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - A9 Autry Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 73 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - House - A10 Butler Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - House - A11 Cervania Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 84 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - House - A12 Harrison Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 72 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - House - A13 Longest Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - House - A14 Longest Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 73 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - House - A15 Morey Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 86 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - House - A16 Prather Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 76 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - House - A17 Pierce Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 76 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - A1 Autry Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 69 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-28 - House - A2 Ball Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 81 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-28 - House - A3 Harrison Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 80 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-28 - House - A4 Harrison Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 83 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-28 - House - A5 Longest Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 84 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-28 - House - A6 Morey Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 81 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-28 - House - A7 Morey Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 86 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-28 - House - A8 von Haefen Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 86 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 66 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l M11 Concur (Y: 67 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l M4 Previous Question (Y: 71 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - A9 Autry Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 73 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - House - A10 Butler Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - House - A11 Cervania Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 84 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - House - A12 Harrison Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 72 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - House - A13 Longest Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - House - A14 Longest Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 73 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - House - A15 Morey Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 86 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - House - A16 Prather Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 76 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - House - A17 Pierce Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 76 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - A1 Autry Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 69 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-28 - House - A2 Ball Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 81 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-28 - House - A3 Harrison Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 80 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-28 - House - A4 Harrison Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 83 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-28 - House - A5 Longest Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 84 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-28 - House - A6 Morey Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 81 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-28 - House - A7 Morey Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 86 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-28 - House - A8 von Haefen Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 86 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 66 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | Ch. SL 2023-42 | |
2023-06-14 | Signed by Gov. 6/14/2023 | |
2023-06-09 | Pres. To Gov. 6/9/2023 | |
2023-06-08 | Ratified | |
2023-06-07 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-06-07 | House | Concurred On 3rd Reading |
2023-06-06 | House | Concurred On 2nd Reading |
2023-06-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/06/2023 |
2023-06-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-06-05 | House | Ruled Material |
2023-06-05 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Engrossed |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Amend Tabled A2 |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Com Amend Adopted A1 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Reptd Fav As Amended, Unengrossed |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-03-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-03-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-03-29 | House | Amend Failed A17 |
2023-03-29 | House | Amend Failed A16 |
2023-03-29 | House | Amend Failed A15 |
2023-03-29 | House | Amend Failed A14 |
2023-03-29 | House | Amend Failed A13 |
2023-03-29 | House | Amend Failed A12 |
2023-03-29 | House | Amend Failed A11 |
2023-03-29 | House | Amend Failed A10 |
2023-03-29 | House | Amend Failed A9 |
2023-03-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-03-28 | House | Amend Failed A8 |
2023-03-28 | House | Amend Failed A7 |
2023-03-28 | House | Amend Failed A6 |
2023-03-28 | House | Amend Failed A5 |
2023-03-28 | House | Amend Failed A4 |
2023-03-28 | House | Amend Failed A3 |
2023-03-28 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2023-03-28 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2023-03-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-03-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-03-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2023-03-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary 1 |
2023-03-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-03-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2023-03-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Animals
Chaptered
Colleges & Universities
Commerce
Commissions
Corporations
Councils
Criminal Records
Education
Fees
Fines & Penalties
For-profit
Funds & Accounts
Gaming
Higher Education
Horses & Mules
Information Technology
Internet
Licenses & Permits
Local Government
Lottery
Lottery Comn.
Minorities
Mobile Phones & Devices
Outdoor Heritage Advisory Council
Parks & Recreation Areas
Presented
Privilege
Public
Ratified
Records
Recreation & Leisure
Sports
Studies
Surety & Fidelity
Tax Distribution
Taxation
Taxes
Telecommunications
Telephones
Teleservices
Tribes & Tribal Government
Unc
Administrative Rules
Animals
Chaptered
Colleges & Universities
Commerce
Commissions
Corporations
Councils
Criminal Records
Education
Fees
Fines & Penalties
For-profit
Funds & Accounts
Gaming
Higher Education
Horses & Mules
Information Technology
Internet
Licenses & Permits
Local Government
Lottery
Lottery Comn.
Minorities
Mobile Phones & Devices
Outdoor Heritage Advisory Council
Parks & Recreation Areas
Presented
Privilege
Public
Ratified
Records
Recreation & Leisure
Sports
Studies
Surety & Fidelity
Tax Distribution
Taxation
Taxes
Telecommunications
Telephones
Teleservices
Tribes & Tribal Government
Unc