NC H344 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-9)
Status: Passed on July 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-07 - Ch. SL 2023-80
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-9)
Status: Passed on July 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-07 - Ch. SL 2023-80
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Mental Health Lic. Fair Practice Stds
Title
Mental Health Lic. Fair Practice Stds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-07 | Ch. SL 2023-80 | |
2023-07-07 | Signed by Gov. 7/7/2023 | |
2023-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2023 | |
2023-06-28 | Ratified | |
2023-06-27 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-06-27 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2023-06-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2023 |
2023-06-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-06-15 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-06-14 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Engrossed |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-04-05 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-04-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-04 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-04-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-13 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S291 (Same As) 2023-06-12 - Ch. SL 2023-40
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgeting
Chaptered
Child Care Comn.
Clinics
Commissions
Day Care
Dhhs
Early Childhood Education
Education
Elementary Education
Employment
Government Employees
Health Services
Hospitals
Inspections
Investigations
Kindergarten
Licenses & Permits
Mental Health
Minors
Newborns & Infants
Presented
Public
Ratified
Reports
Session Laws
Social Services
State Employees
Teachers
Title Change
Budgeting
Chaptered
Child Care Comn.
Clinics
Commissions
Day Care
Dhhs
Early Childhood Education
Education
Elementary Education
Employment
Government Employees
Health Services
Hospitals
Inspections
Investigations
Kindergarten
Licenses & Permits
Mental Health
Minors
Newborns & Infants
Presented
Public
Ratified
Reports
Session Laws
Social Services
State Employees
Teachers
Title Change