NC H337 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Const. Amendment/Repeal Literacy Test

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Const. Amendment/Repeal Literacy Test

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-06-16HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-30HouseRe-ref Com On State Government
2021-03-30HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-22HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-22HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-18HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
CVI-4(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback