NC H335 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Ch. SL 2018-129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Ch. SL 2018-129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Restore Last Saturday Early One-Stop
Title
Restore Last Saturday Early One-Stop
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 70 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 70 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | Ch. SL 2018-129 | |
2018-07-09 | Signed by Gov. 7/9/2018 | |
2018-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2018 | |
2018-06-29 | Ratified | |
2018-06-28 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-28 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2018-06-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-27 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/26/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-14 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2017-03-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-13 | House | Filed |