NC H299 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Perpetual Care of Certain Cemeteries
Title
Perpetual Care of Certain Cemeteries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-04-28 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-24 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2023-04-20 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-08 | House | Ref to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
65 | 48 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
65 | 53 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
65 | 65 | (n/a) | Citation Text |