NC H29 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Record of Excusals From Jury Duty
Title
Record of Excusals From Jury Duty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-20 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/19/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-04-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-01 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary III |
2017-02-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S60 (Same As) 2017-02-16 - Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate